Daily Law Journal

Case Information

2/20/2024
24CVG00158
Dayton Municipal

Miami Valley Housing Opportunities
Shannon James and all other occupants, et al
Judgment: Agreed Entry

Laurence A Lasky of Lasky & Scharrer

Docket History

2/14/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

2/14/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

2/2/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

2/2/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

2/1/2024
Eviction Hearing - Lasky

1/10/2024
Forcible Entry & Detainer