Daily Law Journal

Case Information

3/26/2025
24CVF06446
Dayton Municipal

Discover Bank
Felita R Jordan
Civil Trial

Franklin W Gehres
Kathleen M Smith of Weltman, Weinbery & Reis Co., L.P.A

Docket History

3/26/2025
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Summary Judgment

2/4/2025
Motion For Leave To File A Motion For Summary Judgment

1/22/2025
Motion For Continuance

12/10/2024
Answer

11/8/2024
Contract / Account Cases