Daily Law Journal

Case Information

3/31/2025
24CVF06090
Dayton Municipal

Midland Credit Management Inc
John Richardson
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Consent Judgment

Mia Wortham Spells
Kevin Klekota of Midland Funding

Docket History

3/13/2025
Pre Trial/ Telephone Conference

12/12/2024
Pre Trial/ Telephone Conference

11/6/2024
Answer

10/21/2024
Contract / Account Cases