Daily Law Journal

Case Information

5/9/2025
24CVF05335
Dayton Municipal

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc
Dale Thompson
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Summary Judgment

Christopher D Roberts
Jill Keck

Docket History

3/10/2025
Phone Pretrial

12/30/2024
Phone Pretrial

10/15/2024
Answer

9/13/2024
Contract / Account Cases