Daily Law Journal

Case Information

3/26/2025
24CVF05288
Dayton Municipal

BCG Equities, LLC
Deborrah Morgan
Civil Trial

Franklin W Gehres
Hunter E Seide of Law Offices Of Timothy M Sullivan

Docket History

3/5/2025
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Summary Judgment

2/28/2025
Motion For Default Judgment

1/23/2025
Civil Trial

1/22/2025
Motion For Continuance

12/3/2024
Answer

9/11/2024
Contract / Account Cases