Daily Law Journal

Case Information

3/27/2025
24CVF03617
Dayton Municipal

State Of Ohio Wright State University
Sarah D Brown
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Summary Judgment

Mia Wortham Spells
Robert A Schuerger II

Docket History

3/6/2025
Civil Trial

2/25/2025
Motion For Continuance

2/25/2025
Motion For Leave To File A Motion For Summary Judgment

10/10/2024
Pre Trial/ Telephone Conference

8/6/2024
Answer

6/14/2024
Contract / Account Cases