Daily Law Journal

Case Information

5/15/2025
24CVF02939
Dayton Municipal

Lvnv Funding Llc
Cynthia Sanford
Civil Trial

Mia Wortham Spells
Andrew A Beier of Messerli & Kramer P A

Docket History

2/21/2025
Motion For Continuance

2/18/2025
Motion For Continuance

10/10/2024
Pre Trial/ Telephone Conference

8/6/2024
Pre Trial/ Telephone Conference

6/25/2024
Answer

5/15/2024
Contract / Account Cases