Daily Law Journal

Case Information

5/13/2025
24CVF01985
Dayton Municipal

Lvnv Funding L L C
Jennifer Core
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment On The Pleadings

Franklin W Gehres
Anthony J Huspaska of Stenger & Stenger

Docket History

5/9/2025
Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings

2/18/2025
Civil Trial

12/10/2024
Civil Trial

12/6/2024
Motion For Continuance

10/22/2024
Answer

3/27/2024
Contract / Account Cases