Daily Law Journal

Case Information

9/25/2024
24CVF01056
Dayton Municipal

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc
Ashley Mims
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Summary Judgment

Mia Wortham Spells
Jill Keck of Weltman Weinberg & Reis

Docket History

7/29/2024
Motion For Summary Judgment

7/2/2024
Pre Trial/ Telephone Conference

4/23/2024
Pre Trial/ Telephone Conference

3/15/2024
Answer

2/21/2024
Contract / Account Cases