Daily Law Journal

Case Information

3/20/2025
24CVF00919
Dayton Municipal

Onemain Financial Group, Llc
Shaun L Edwards
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

Erin Enderle of Levy & Associates

Docket History

3/20/2025
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

3/18/2025
Garnishment Hearing

9/11/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Default Judgment

9/4/2024
Motion For Default Judgment

2/14/2024
Contract / Account Cases