Daily Law Journal

Case Information

9/3/2024
24CVF00469
Dayton Municipal

JPMorgan Chase Bank
Joey B Rettig
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Default Judgment

Jessica E Goldstein of Lyons, Doughty & Veldhuis, P.C.

Docket History

8/22/2024
Motion For Extension Of Time

8/20/2024
Motion For Extension Of Time

7/2/2024
Motion For Extension Of Time

6/20/2024
Motion For Extension Of Time

1/23/2024
Contract / Account Cases