Daily Law Journal

Case Information

7/9/2024
24CVF00370
Dayton Municipal

Cory B Sellers, DD, LLC dba Dayton Comprehensive Dentisty
Qiana Hill
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Summary Judgment

Franklin W Gehres
Brandon A. Blackburn

Docket History

5/16/2024
Motion For Summary Judgment

4/10/2024
Civil Trial

4/1/2024
Motion For Continuance

2/26/2024
Motion For Default Judgment

2/22/2024
Answer

1/19/2024
Contract / Account Cases