Daily Law Journal

Case Information

3/1/2024
23CVI07183
Dayton Municipal

J Enterprise Construction Inc
The Q Group Builders
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Dismissal

Joseph C Lucas of Law Office Of Joseph C. Lucas, Llc

Docket History

3/1/2024
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Dismissal

2/28/2024
Small Claims Hearing

1/31/2024
Small Claims Hearing

1/25/2024
Motion For Continuance

12/29/2023
Small Claims