Daily Law Journal

Case Information

7/9/2024
23CVI06689
Dayton Municipal

Isaiah a Yates
James Randolph
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Dismissal


Docket History

7/9/2024
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Dismissal

2/7/2024
Small Claims Hearing

2/6/2024
Motion For Continuance

1/10/2024
Small Claims Hearing

12/5/2023
Small Claims