Daily Law Journal

Case Information

1/30/2024
23CVI04883
Dayton Municipal

REM Investments, LLC
United Building Solutions LLC, et al
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Dismissal


Docket History

1/30/2024
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Dismissal

1/24/2024
Small Claims Hearing

12/6/2023
Small Claims Hearing

12/1/2023
Motion Of The Plantiff / Plaintiff Attorney To Appear By Phone

10/18/2023
Small Claims Hearing