Daily Law Journal

Case Information

12/3/2024
23CVG07166
Dayton Municipal

Proper Management, LLC
Sabrina Moore and all others
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision Granting Sealing Of The Eviction Record

Steven C. Katchman

Docket History

12/3/2024
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision Granting Sealing Of The Eviction Record

3/18/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

3/18/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

3/15/2024
Eviction Hearing - Katchman

2/16/2024
Eviction Hearing - Katchman

2/2/2024
Eviction Hearing - Katchman

1/19/2024
Eviction Hearing - Katchman

12/28/2023
Forcible Entry & Detainer