Daily Law Journal

Case Information

2/12/2024
23CVG06939
Dayton Municipal

John S Gaitawe
Amelia Williams
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre


Docket History

2/12/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

2/1/2024
Eviction Hearing - Non-Attorney

1/18/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Dismissal

1/18/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Dismissal

1/17/2024
Motion To Reschedule Or Rehear Court Hearing

1/11/2024
Eviction Hearing - Non-Attorney

12/18/2023
Forcible Entry & Detainer