Daily Law Journal

Case Information

4/8/2025
23CVG01191
Dayton Municipal

Pathfinder Realty, Inc
Moncierra Taylor and all other occupants
Judgment: Entry And Order

Franklin W Gehres
Steven C. Katchman

Docket History

3/27/2025
Motion To Vacate

1/12/2024
Eviction Hearing - Katchman

12/12/2023
Judgment: Entry Overruling The Defendant's Objection To The Magistrates Decision.

11/2/2023
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

11/2/2023
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

10/16/2023
Motion Hearing

10/16/2023
Motion To Dismiss