Daily Law Journal

Case Information

4/11/2025
23CVF07031
Dayton Municipal

Midland Credit Management Inc
Ronda Ogletree
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry

Deirdre E Logan
Madelyn Adamission

Docket History

3/27/2024
Motion For Summary Judgment

3/19/2024
Motion For Leave To File A Motion For Summary Judgment

3/13/2024
Phone Pretrial

2/7/2024
Phone Pretrial

1/17/2024
Answer

12/21/2023
Contract / Account Cases