Daily Law Journal

Case Information

8/22/2024
23CVF04686
Dayton Municipal

Citibank
Aundrey Carter
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Summary Judgment

Mia Wortham Spells
Jill Keck of Weltman Weinberg & Reis

Docket History

6/26/2024
Motion For Leave To File A Motion For Summary Judgment

6/4/2024
Pre Trial/ Telephone Conference

4/2/2024
Pre Trial/ Telephone Conference

2/13/2024
Pre Trial/ Telephone Conference

1/9/2024
Answer