Daily Law Journal

Case Information

1/12/2024
23CVF03002
Kettering Municipal Assignments

TD BANK USA, N.A. C/O TARGET ENTERPRISE, INC
WILLENA J COTTERMAN

JAMES LONG

Docket History

12/19/2023

12/19/2023

12/19/2023

12/8/2023

12/8/2023

10/31/2023

9/26/2023

8/22/2023