Daily Law Journal

Case Information

6/17/2024
23CVF02967
Dayton Municipal

Citibank
Marlene Chapman
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

Carl S Henderson
Jill Keck of Weltman Weinberg & Reis

Docket History

6/17/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

4/29/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

4/29/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

4/11/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Default Judgment

4/4/2024
Motion For Summary Judgment

4/1/2024
Motion For Leave To File A Motion For Summary Judgment

2/14/2024
Motion For Continuance

2/12/2024
Motion For Continuance