Daily Law Journal

Case Information

2/28/2024
23CVF02565
Kettering Municipal Assignments

STEVE RAUCH, INC
JENNIFER B HURSEY

FREDERICK DRESSEL

Docket History

1/15/2024
JENNIFER B HURSEY

1/9/2024

12/7/2023

12/7/2023

11/8/2023

11/8/2023

9/28/2023

6/27/2023