Daily Law Journal

Case Information

8/16/2024
22CVF04263
Dayton Municipal

NREA VB V LLC
Jacquline Baker, et al
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

Jeffrey L Koberg of Law Offices Of Timothy M Sullivan

Docket History

8/16/2024
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

8/13/2024
Garnishment Hearing

4/25/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

4/25/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

4/22/2024
Damages

2/26/2024
Damages