Case Information
11/27/2019
2019CV00743
Common Pleas
Antonio D. Miller
Ohio Bureau Of Workers Compensation
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/10/19 AT 10 A.M.
Shawn Wollam
Docket History
8/19/2019
DECISION
7/12/2019
DECISION
ENTRY AND ORDER OF CONTINUANCE
6/5/2019
ORDER SETTING HEARING
HEARING SET FOR 6/19/19 AT 3:30 P.M.
6/5/2019
ORDER SETTING HEARING
HEARING SET FOR 6/19/19 AT 3:30 P.M.
6/5/2019
ORDER SETTING HEARING
HEARING SET FOR 6/19/19 AT 3:30 P.M.
6/5/2019
ORDER SETTING HEARING
HEARING SET FOR 6/19/19 AT 3:30 P.M.
4/23/2019
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
2/14/2019
WORKER COMPENSATION