ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON JUNE 10, 2016, RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE JUNE 24, 2016 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE JULY 01, 2016
Pro Se
Docket History
4/13/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON JUNE 10, 2016, RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE JUNE 24, 2016 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE JULY 01, 2016
4/13/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON JUNE 10, 2016, RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE JUNE 24, 2016 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE JULY 01, 2016
4/13/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON JUNE 10, 2016, RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE JUNE 24, 2016 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE JULY 01, 2016
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON APRIL 13, 2016 AT 9:15 AM
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON APRIL 13, 2016 AT 9:15 AM
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON APRIL 13, 2016 AT 9:15 AM
3/8/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON APRIL 13, 2016 AT 9:15 AM
1/15/2016
ORDER: CONSOLIDATE CASE(S)
2015CV6329 AND 2015CV6518
1/15/2016
ORDER: CONSOLIDATE CASE(S)
2015CV6329 AND 2015CV6518