Daily Law Journal

Case Information

3/8/2016
2015CV05794
Common Pleas

Capital One Bank Usa N.a.
Erin E Snowden
JUDGMENT ENTRY Receipt: 1091581 Date: 03/08/2016

Andrew Schreiber

Docket History

3/8/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY Receipt: 1091581 Date: 03/08/2016

3/8/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY Receipt: 1091581 Date: 03/08/2016

3/8/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY Receipt: 1091581 Date: 03/08/2016

1/25/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE NEW SERVICE TO BE ISSUED ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 1, 2016

1/25/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE NEW SERVICE TO BE ISSUED ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 1, 2016

11/2/2015
CIVIL ALL OTHER