Daily Law Journal

Case Information

2/25/2016
2015CV03992
Common Pleas

Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company
Larry E Looney Ii
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE

Kevin String

Docket History

2/25/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE

2/25/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE

2/25/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE

2/4/2016
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DAMAGES ON MARCH 03, 2016 AT 10:00 AM

2/4/2016
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DAMAGES ON MARCH 03, 2016 AT 10:00 AM

2/4/2016
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DAMAGES ON MARCH 03, 2016 AT 10:00 AM

2/4/2016
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DAMAGES ON MARCH 03, 2016 AT 10:00 AM

1/25/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS .

1/25/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS .

7/31/2015
CIVIL ALL OTHER