Docket History
2/12/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
ALLOWING PLAINTIFF AN ADDITIONAL FOURTEEN DAYS TO SUPPLEMENT OR AMEND ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
2/12/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
ALLOWING PLAINTIFF AN ADDITIONAL FOURTEEN DAYS TO SUPPLEMENT OR AMEND ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
2/8/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER
2/8/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER
2/8/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER
2/8/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER
9/18/2015
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON OCTOBER 23, 2015 AT 915AM
7/10/2015
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE