Docket History
2/24/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - CASE SETTLED
2/24/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - CASE SETTLED
2/24/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - CASE SETTLED
2/24/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - CASE SETTLED
2/9/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - CASE SETTLED
2/9/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - CASE SETTLED
2/9/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - CASE SETTLED
9/18/2015
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON OCTOBER 8, 2015 AT 830AM
8/13/2015
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
15 CV 3492
7/7/2015
WORKER COMPENSATION