ORDER: DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE Receipt: 1082627 Date: 01/11/2016
Brett Bissonnette
Docket History
1/11/2016
ORDER: DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE Receipt: 1082627 Date: 01/11/2016
8/19/2015
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING DEFENDANT HUMACARE CONSOLIDATED EMPLOYEE MANAGEMENTS MOTION TO DISMISS CASE AS AGAINST HUMACARE CONSOLIDATED EMPLOYEE MANAGEMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE
8/11/2015
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON AUGUST 27, 2015 AT 1:30 PM
7/22/2015
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
DEFENDANT HUMACARE CONSOLIDATED EMPLOYEE MANAGEMENT MOTION TO DISMISS - SUBMISSION DATE AUGUST 14, 2015