Docket History
4/15/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - CASE SETTLED
4/15/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - CASE SETTLED
4/15/2016
ORDER: DISMISS - CASE SETTLED
4/7/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON APRIL 15, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
4/7/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON APRIL 15, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
4/7/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON APRIL 15, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
1/15/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
ORDER REQUIRING JOINDER
1/15/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
ORDER REQUIRING JOINDER
8/4/2015
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING IN-CHAMBERS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ON AUGUST 18, 2015 AT 8:30 AM
7/22/2015
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER