Daily Law Journal

Case Information

3/15/2016
2014DR00585
Common Pleas

Jody Underwood
Erin Underwood
MOTION & ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 05/25/2016 @ 11:00 AM

Brian Sommers

Docket History

3/15/2016
MOTION & ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 05/25/2016 @ 11:00 AM

3/15/2016
MOTION & ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 05/25/2016 @ 11:00 AM

3/15/2016
MOTION & ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 05/25/2016 @ 11:00 AM

8/25/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 11/3/2014 @ 9:30 AM

8/25/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 11/3/2014 @ 9:30 AM

6/19/2014
COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE WITH CHILDREN FILED

6/19/2014
DIVORCE WITH CHILDREN