Daily Law Journal

Case Information

8/15/2014
2014DR00584
Common Pleas

Kaitlyn B Walters
R Craig Frisby
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- ON OCTOBER 6, 2014 @ 9:30AM

Michael Davis

Docket History

8/15/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- ON OCTOBER 6, 2014 @ 9:30AM

8/5/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- ON AUGUST 27, 2014 @ 11:00AM

8/5/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- ON AUGUST 27, 2014 @ 11:00AM

7/17/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 8-19-14 @2:30 P.M.

7/17/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 8-19-14 @2:30 P.M.

6/19/2014
COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED