Daily Law Journal

Case Information

10/2/2015
2014DR00417
Common Pleas

Kelley A Mobley
Stephan M Mobley Jr
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 12/08/2015 @ 9:00 AM

Richard Arthur

Docket History

5/29/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- AUGUST 4, 2014 @ 8:30 AM

5/29/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- AUGUST 4, 2014 @ 8:30 AM

4/29/2014
DIVORCE WITH CHILDREN

4/29/2014
DIVORCE WITH CHILDREN