Daily Law Journal

Case Information

2/4/2016
2014CV02617
Common Pleas

Jpmorgan Chase Bank National Association
Montina Smith
ORDER: VACATE JUDGMENT ENTRY Receipt: 1086646 Date: 02/04/2016

Bethany Suttinger

Docket History

2/4/2016
ORDER: VACATE JUDGMENT ENTRY Receipt: 1086646 Date: 02/04/2016

2/4/2016
ORDER: VACATE JUDGMENT ENTRY Receipt: 1086646 Date: 02/04/2016

2/4/2016
ORDER: VACATE JUDGMENT ENTRY Receipt: 1086646 Date: 02/04/2016

7/29/2015
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE

8/22/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE

8/22/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE

7/10/2014
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

7/10/2014
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

5/5/2014
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE