Docket History
1/15/2016
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
- AUTOMATIC STAY FILED BY ELLEN FORNASH
8/14/2015
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
REACTIVATING CASE FOR POST-JUDGMENT PROCEEDINGS ONLY
3/18/2014
NOTICE: BANKRUPCTY - NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY OF EXECUTION
FILED BY MIRANDA HAMRICK
3/18/2014
NOTICE: BANKRUPCTY - NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY OF EXECUTION
FILED BY MIRANDA HAMRICK
3/12/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ENTRY WITHDRAWING PROPERTY FROM SHERIFF'S SALE
3/12/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ENTRY WITHDRAWING PROPERTY FROM SHERIFF'S SALE
11/14/2013
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
9/25/2013
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE