Daily Law Journal

Case Information

5/12/2014
2012DR00383
Common Pleas

Mark E Stiver
Lisa D Stiver
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JUNE 17, 2014 @ 8:30 AM

Richard Arthur

Docket History

5/12/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JUNE 17, 2014 @ 8:30 AM

5/12/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JUNE 17, 2014 @ 8:30 AM

5/12/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JUNE 17, 2014 @ 8:30 AM

5/16/2012
ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION

4/24/2012
Order Scheduling Pretrial Conference /Settlement Conference

4/11/2012
DIVORCE WITH CHILDREN