Docket History
11/26/2013
ORDER: DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE
10/10/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE 11-22-13 @ 9:00 A.M.
9/9/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPONE 10-8-13 @ 10:30 A.M.
7/9/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE 8-28-13 @ 9:00 A.M.
6/18/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE 6-15-13 @ 9:45 A.M.
5/24/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE 6-12-13 @ 9:45 A.M.
2/28/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE 4-24-13 @ 9:00 A.M.
1/10/2013
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE 2-17-13 @ 9:00 A.M.
11/30/2012
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE 1-8-13 @ 9:30 A.M.
10/24/2012
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE 11-30-12 @ 9:15 A.M.
5/7/2012
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE 6-5-12
3/26/2012
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE