Docket History
1/15/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- FEB 13, 2014 @ 3:30 PM
7/27/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- OCT 29, 2012 @ 9:30 AM
2/10/2012
AGREED ORDER
1/20/2012
Notice of Oral Hearing
1/20/2012
Order scheduling pretrial conference/settlement conference
1/18/2012
Answer and Counterclaim of Defendant
1/13/2012
TEMPORARY ORDER
12/30/2011
Order scheduling final hearing
12/23/2011
Order requiring parties to attend “Helping Children Succeed After Divorce” seminar
12/15/2011
for divorce and other relief