Daily Law Journal

Case Information

6/11/2014
2011DR01407
Common Pleas

Charlotte D Carter
Christopher D Hall Jr
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JULY 24, 2014 @ 9:00 AM

Sea Staff Attorney

Docket History

6/11/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JULY 24, 2014 @ 9:00 AM

8/8/2012
SEEK WORK ORDER - AND ORDER TO REPORT TO JOB CENTER (AS STATED) FILED AND ISSUED: CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT (CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT);

5/7/2012
Magistrate Decision and Permanent Order Adopting Final Judgment and Decree

4/3/2012
Order Scheduling Final Hearing

3/1/2012
TEMPORARY ORDER

1/18/2012
Order scheduling final hearing

12/12/2011
Order Requiring Parties To Attend “Helping Children Succeed After Divorce” Seminar

12/7/2011
DIVORCE WITH CHILDREN