Daily Law Journal

Case Information

5/16/2014
2011DR01385
Common Pleas

Georgia C Woodward
David C Woodward
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JUNE 11, 2014 @ 11:00 AM

David McNamee

Docket History

5/16/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JUNE 11, 2014 @ 11:00 AM

5/16/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JUNE 11, 2014 @ 11:00 AM

1/9/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- AUGUST 5, 2013 @ 1:30 PM

5/21/2012
Order Scheduling Settlement Conference and Trial Dates

5/14/2012
Order Scheduling Settlement Conference

2/3/2012
Order Scheduling Pretrial Conference /Settlement Conference

1/30/2012
TEMPORARY ORDER

12/30/2011
Order scheduling Pretrial Conference/settlement conference

12/28/2011
Motion for Temporary Restraining Orders

12/28/2011
Temporary Restraining Orders

12/28/2011
Answer and Counterclaim of Defendant

12/9/2011
ORDER SCHEDULING FINAL HEARING

11/30/2011
For divorce, temporary restraining orders and other relief