Daily Law Journal

Case Information

6/10/2014
2011DR00624
Common Pleas

Jennifer L Watkins
Jeffrey A Watkins
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JULY 25, 2014 @ 1:30 PM

David Mesaros

Docket History

6/10/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JULY 25, 2014 @ 1:30 PM

7/19/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- OCTOBER 19, 2012 @ 9:00 AM

12/5/2011
Agreed Order

11/15/2011
Order Scheduling Pretrial Conference and Order Continuing Settlement Conference

10/19/2011
Motion for Hearing on Temporary Order

10/19/2011
Motion for Hearing on Temporary Order

10/4/2011
TEMPORARY ORDER