Daily Law Journal

Case Information

6/10/2014
2011DR00498
Common Pleas

Jeffrey A Dunker
Melissa A Dunker
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JUNE 26, 2014 @ 11:00 AM

David Mesaros

Docket History

6/10/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JUNE 26, 2014 @ 11:00 AM

6/19/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JUNE 29, 2012 # 3:30 PM

2/10/2012
Entry & Order Scheduling Interview and Trial

11/30/2011
Entry and Order setting telephone pre-trial