NOTICE: BANKRUPCTY - NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY OF EXECUTION
FILED BY Charles Roedersheimer
Patrick Dunphy
Docket History
11/25/2015
NOTICE: BANKRUPCTY - NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY OF EXECUTION
FILED BY Charles Roedersheimer
11/25/2015
NOTICE: BANKRUPCTY - NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY OF EXECUTION
FILED BY Charles Roedersheimer
11/25/2015
NOTICE: BANKRUPCTY - NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY OF EXECUTION
FILED BY Charles Roedersheimer
5/8/2013
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF RECEIVER TO PROCEED TO CLOSING
12/28/2012
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
ENTRY AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE (PROPOSED)
12/28/2012
DECISION
SUSTAINING MOTION OF PLAINTIFF BARBARA J. MOSHER FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR DECREE OF FORECLOSURE AND MARSHALLING OF LIENS
10/10/2012
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 11/6/2012 @ 10:30 A.M.
6/13/2012
DECISION
OVERRULING MOTION BY PLAINTIFF TO CONFIRM SETTLEMENT BETWEEN THE PLAINTIFF AND FIFTH THIRD BANK AND SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART DEFENDANT FIFTH THIRD BANK?S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT
3/2/2012
PROPOSED ENTRY AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED PLEADING
12/28/2011
Entry signed by judge order granting attorneys Jeffrey T. Cox and Martin A Foos & the Law Firm of Faruki Ireland & Cox P.L.L. to withdraw from representation of plaintiff Barbara J. Mosher
11/18/2011
DECISION SETTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE; DECISION SUSTAINING DEFENDANT FIFTH THIRD BANK'S MOTION TO ESTABLISH SALE PROCEDURE AND OVERRULING MOTION BY LAINTIFF BARBARA J MOTHSER: 1. TO APPOINT A SUBSTITUTE RECIEVER AND 2. TO AUTHORIZE THE