Daily Law Journal

Case Information

4/27/2016
2010CV05706
Common Pleas

Pnc Mortgage A Division Of Pnc Bank National Association Successor By Merger To National City Mortgage Division Of National City Bank Of Indiana
Cheryl L Guenther
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE ON 5/27/16 FILED BY Jennifer Schaeffer

Anthony Osterlund

Docket History

4/27/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE ON 5/27/16 FILED BY Jennifer Schaeffer

4/27/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE ON 5/27/16 FILED BY Jennifer Schaeffer

4/27/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE ON 5/27/16 FILED BY Jennifer Schaeffer

2/4/2016
DECISION OVERRULING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS

2/4/2016
DECISION OVERRULING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS

2/4/2016
DECISION OVERRULING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS

2/4/2016
DECISION OVERRULING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS

9/7/2012
DECISION OVERRULING DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE'S DECISION

4/4/2012
Order Setting Submission Date

3/29/2012
JUDGMENT ENTRY

3/1/2012
ORDER RESETTING COURT TRIAL DATE 4-24-12

12/29/2011
Order/Pretrial Order setting status conference by telephone on Feb 22, 2012

12/21/2011
Order setting hearing on plaintiff's motion to enforce settlement for attorneys fees, and to amend scheduling order on December 29, 2011 from 9:00am to 11:00am

11/28/2011
Order: setting Bench Trial on Dec 29

10/24/2011
Order setting Telephone Status Conference on Nov 28