Daily Law Journal

Case Information

6/12/2014
2009DR00579
Common Pleas

Sarah Shepler
James M Shepler
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JULY 21, 2014 @ 2:30 PM

Keith Kearney

Docket History

6/12/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JULY 21, 2014 @ 2:30 PM

2/1/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 3/28/2013 AT 2:30PM.

12/17/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JANUARY 31, 2013 @ 1:30 PM FOR 2 HOURS

7/6/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- SEPT 14, 2012 @ 1:30 PM

2/3/2012
Dependent Health Care Order Qualified Medical Child Support Orders