Daily Law Journal

Case Information

5/28/2014
2007DR00009
Common Pleas

Roger E Streidl
Cinthia A Streidl
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- ON JUNE 16, 2014 @11:00AM

Paul Winterhalter

Docket History

5/28/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- ON JUNE 16, 2014 @11:00AM

5/28/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- ON JUNE 16, 2014 @11:00AM

5/2/2012
NOTICE OF POTENTIAL DISMISSAL OF MOTION

4/13/2012
Magistrate Order for Agreed Entry to be filed within 14 days

1/30/2012
SUMMONS-CONTEMPT

12/27/2011
Amended Motion to modify parenting time/Motion to decrease child support/Motion to modify dependent health care order/Motion to Show and Motion for Atty Fees and costs

12/27/2011
Order to appear

12/16/2011
Notice of service of Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents upon Defendant

12/5/2011
Agreed Order