Daily Law Journal

Case Information

6/10/2014
2006DR01112
Common Pleas

Douglas Callahan
Sherry Callahan
ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON AUGUST 1, 2014 @ 1:30 PM

David McNamee

Docket History

6/10/2014
ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON AUGUST 1, 2014 @ 1:30 PM

9/11/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG-11-1-13 @ 10:00AM

6/20/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- SEPTEMBER 4, 2013 @ 2:30 PM