Daily Law Journal

Case Information

6/4/2019
18CVF04009
Kettering Municipal Assignments

JUANITA A HAMILTON
KRISTINE B KELLER-PAWLAK and SCHLIENTZ AND MOORE FUNERAL HOME

FREDERICK DRESSEL

Docket History

6/3/2019

4/23/2019

2/18/2019

1/31/2019

1/31/2019